U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50016
  • Case Name: Stephanie Lynn Bussiere
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case to 13]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Case to 13]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case to 13 (no fee required)]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Case to 13 (no fee required)]
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.