U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30001
  • Case Name: Kimberly Renae Lauing
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.