U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50013
  • Case Name: Steven Patrick Kennison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.