U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-05001
  • Case Name: Ortiz et al v. AAA Collections, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 08, 2020: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Certified Copy]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 25, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 28, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • April 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Additional Summons Issued]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.