U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10007
  • Case Name: Corey Allen Dennert and Jessica Lee Dennert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale (Text Entry)]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • January 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Rejection]
  • January 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • January 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.