U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10140
  • Case Name: Robyn Nicole Stemper
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
October, 2019
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.