U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10137
  • Case Name: James Christopher Tedder and Courtney Lynn Tedder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
October, 2019
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
September, 2019
  • September 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Late Notice]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Intention]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedules A-J]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Corrective Entry]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.