U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04012
  • Case Name: Estrada v. United States Department of Education
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 08, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • September 06, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 05, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
June, 2019
  • June 16, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • June 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Return of Service ]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
March, 2019
  • March 02, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 28, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 16, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • January 26, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Cover Sheet]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.