U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10135
  • Case Name: Amber Rae Dugger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.