U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-40561
  • Case Name: Roy Michael Appleget and Katie Marie Appleget
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.