U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10133
  • Case Name: Eric John Brenner and Kari Elizabeth Brenner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • September 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
November, 2020
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • April 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2020
  • February 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • August 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
June, 2019
  • June 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Chapter 11 to 7 (fee required)]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Case 13 to 11]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Chapter 13 to 11]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.