U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50267
  • Case Name: Lisa Dawn Carlow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismissing Case]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Creditor List]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.