U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01003
  • Case Name: Snyder v. Winge et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibits Destroyed]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 29, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • July 29, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 14, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • June 13, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.