U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10130
  • Case Name: Michael DeWayne Sentell and Mary Leone Odland
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
February, 2020
  • February 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • September 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Joinder]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sealed Document - To be used only when ordered by the Court]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Seal]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Seal]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Seal]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.