U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40570
  • Case Name: Michael Anthony Whitis and Carla Dianne Whitis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reopen Case (text order)]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
June, 2022
  • June 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Case Closed Without a Discharge]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
April, 2022
  • April 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (deactivated)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplemental Proof of Claim for CARES Forbearance Claim]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplemental Proof of Claim for CARES Forbearance Claim]
September, 2021
  • September 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • July 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.