U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10129
  • Case Name: Daniel David Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Affidavit of Default]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.