U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05009
  • Case Name: Allred v. Houlette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 30, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.