U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30051
  • Case Name: Tyann Jo Baloun
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
April, 2019
  • April 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.