U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50256
  • Case Name: Jeremy Del Haskell and Michelle Rae Haskell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule J]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule H]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule G]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule E/F]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule D]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule A/B]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.