U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40546
  • Case Name: Gregory Gene Plamp and Sheryl Ann Plamp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2020
  • May 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • January 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • September 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • September 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacating Order (Text Order)]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • June 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
February, 2019
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.