U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04163
  • Case Name: McConnell v. The Flexible Benefits Plan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • December 22, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 25, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 16, 2015: [Return of Service Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 27, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 27, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.