U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05077
  • Case Name: Hernandez-Mendoza v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 12, 2016: [Response]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [Response]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • October 26, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.