U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04162
  • Case Name: Decker v. Deerfield Hutterian Brethren Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • February 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order of Transfer - Other Division]
  • February 10, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 10, 2016: [Change Venue]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • December 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 01, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 03, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 23, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 23, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 23, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.