U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04140
  • Case Name: Wuertzer et al v. Stadium International Trucks, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Discovery Report]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Set Aside Default]
  • February 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 11, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 11, 2016: [Default Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 21, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 21, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 21, 2016: [Default Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.