U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04161
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Mollem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 06, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 05, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • July 14, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 08, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 30, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 18, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • February 16, 2016: [Supplement]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • October 22, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.