U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04160
  • Case Name: Schultz v. Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Judgment - Consent]
  • August 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 09, 2016: [Declaration]
  • May 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Compel]
  • April 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2016: [Protective Order]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • November 24, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 23, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 22, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.