U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05075
  • Case Name: Titus v. Riley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 01, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismiss Party]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • January 12, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 01, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Discovery Report]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 06, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 29, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 24, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • March 17, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 04, 2016: [Leave to]
  • March 04, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Stay]
  • March 04, 2016: [Response]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Extend]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 23, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 18, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 08, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 01, 2015: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • December 01, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 19, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.