U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04135
  • Case Name: Stanga v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 02, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Settlement Agreement]
  • November 10, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • October 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.