U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05074
  • Case Name: CenturyLink Communications, LLC v. B & B Foundation Service Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 01, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Response]
  • June 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 05, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 04, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Leave to]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 23, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 23, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Response]
  • June 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 25, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 25, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • April 08, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 09, 2015: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 15, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 15, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 15, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.