U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04158
  • Case Name: Vermillion Area Chamber of Commerce and Development Company v. Eagle Creek Software S
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Reply]
  • November 25, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 25, 2015: [Strike]
  • November 13, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 12, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 23, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2015: [Stay]
  • October 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: [Remand]
  • October 13, 2015: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 13, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • October 13, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 13, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.