U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04159
  • Case Name: Mathison v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 23, 2017: [USCA Order]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 26, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • November 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 21, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 21, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 17, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • September 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 23, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 03, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 03, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • October 21, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 13, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.