U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05073
  • Case Name: Riley v. Weber et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Letter Sent]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 01, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Transmittal of Documents]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 11, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 06, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • February 06, 2017: [Reply]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Received]
  • January 17, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 17, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 13, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Reply]
  • November 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition (28:2254)]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 13, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Supplement]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 17, 2016: [Leave to]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 11, 2016: [Stay]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 13, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • October 13, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 13, 2015: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.