U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04156
  • Case Name: Roggenbauer v. Limoges
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 15, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Mail Returned]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 21, 2016: [Extend]
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 17, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 13, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 04, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 08, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 08, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 08, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 08, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 08, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.