U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04155
  • Case Name: Fuller v. Schethe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Lifting Stay]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2015: [Stay]
  • November 06, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2015: [Return of Service Executed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2015: [Return of Service Executed]
  • October 16, 2015: [Certificate]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 07, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 07, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.