U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05072
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Work First Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 24, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [Consent]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2016: [Receipt]
  • January 26, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 31, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 23, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 16, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • November 03, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 03, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 02, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • October 07, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 07, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.