U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04154
  • Case Name: Raml v. Raml
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 30, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 16, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 16, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 16, 2017: [Response]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 23, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 23, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Compel]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 09, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 14, 2016: [Brief]
  • October 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Subpoena Returned]
  • October 06, 2016: [Return of Service]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Protective Order]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Subpoena Returned]
  • July 13, 2016: [Return of Service]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 02, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 02, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 02, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 02, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.