U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03018
  • Case Name: Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe v. Jewell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Reply]
  • April 03, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2018: [Response]
  • April 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 19, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2018: [Response]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 27, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 13, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 13, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • February 12, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 24, 2018: [Extend]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 12, 2017: [Leave to]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 22, 2017: [Admission]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 12, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 11, 2017: [Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Discovery Report]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 07, 2017: [Extend]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 05, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2017: [Intervene]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 13, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 21, 2016: [Extend]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Reply]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 04, 2016: [Extend]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 26, 2016: [Extend]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Change Venue]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Leave to]
  • December 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 21, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 21, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 16, 2015: [Leave to]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 02, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 02, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 02, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.