U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04152
  • Case Name: Ford v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Receipt]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 06, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Letter Sent]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2016: [Response]
  • August 18, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2016: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 05, 2016: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
  • February 03, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 21, 2015: [Certificate]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Certificate]
  • November 13, 2015: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 30, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • October 01, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.