U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04151
  • Case Name: Kiir v. State of North Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Received]
  • November 14, 2016: [Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Electronic Transfer)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Transfer - Other District]
  • November 07, 2016: [Letter Received]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Leave to]
  • July 15, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 07, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • February 09, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 09, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 09, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 22, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 09, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2015: [Extend]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 27, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 20, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 07, 2015: [Letter Sent]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 30, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 30, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 30, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 30, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.