U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05071
  • Case Name: McElwain v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2016: [Reverse]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Briefing Schedule]
  • January 08, 2016: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • November 03, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Complaint - Social Security Appeal (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 29, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 29, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.