U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04150
  • Case Name: Tsuruta v. Augustana University
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 22, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 22, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 06, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 05, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 03, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2015: [Request]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2015: [Application]
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 28, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 28, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.