U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05070
  • Case Name: Goldsmith v. State of South Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 09, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 14, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • November 25, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 16, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • October 16, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 08, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 25, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 25, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 25, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.