U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04144
  • Case Name: Creek v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [USCA Order]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 03, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • October 13, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 08, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 24, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.