U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04143
  • Case Name: Caskey v. May et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • November 05, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.