U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05069
  • Case Name: Holmes v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 17, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 02, 2016: [Extend]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Reverse]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Briefing Schedule]
  • February 08, 2016: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 31, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Complaint - Social Security Appeal (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 23, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.