U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01030
  • Case Name: Kaiser v. Gortmaker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 21, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 14, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Enforce]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 25, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 25, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • January 22, 2018: [Letter]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 19, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • December 19, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • December 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 17, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 17, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 17, 2017: [Verdict]
  • December 15, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • December 12, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
  • December 12, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 12, 2017: [Jury List]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 06, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2017: [Leave to]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 06, 2017: [Witness List]
  • December 06, 2017: [Reply]
  • December 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 04, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 01, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 01, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 01, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • December 01, 2017: [In Limine]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • July 20, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • July 10, 2017: [Declaration]
  • July 10, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 24, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 24, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 24, 2017: [Response]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 08, 2017: [Declaration]
  • May 08, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 04, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • April 20, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 17, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 17, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 03, 2016: [Protective Order]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice]
  • April 06, 2016: [Extend]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Return of Service]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 11, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Reply]
  • November 10, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 06, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Proposed Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2015: [Proposed Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 23, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.