U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04149
  • Case Name: Franklin v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Letter Sent]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 20, 2015: [Received]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Reply]
  • November 16, 2015: [Dismiss]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Brief]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • September 22, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.