U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04147
  • Case Name: McKenzie v. Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston Group Benefits Disability Claims
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 08, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 19, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 30, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2015: [Receipt]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • September 18, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 18, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 18, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 18, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.