U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04145
  • Case Name: Therm Dynamics Mfg., Inc. v. Cummins Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2016: [Compel]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2016: [Reply]
  • April 01, 2016: [Brief]
  • April 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • November 04, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 18, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 18, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 18, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 18, 2015: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • September 18, 2015: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.