U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05068
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 28, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 18, 2015: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 18, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 18, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • November 05, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 04, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2015: [Leave to]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 15, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 15, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.